MD SB347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Athletic Commission in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Commission; and requiring that an evaluation of the Commission and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Commission be performed on or before December 15, 2028.
Title
State Athletic Commission - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-27 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |