MD SB347 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Task Force to Study the Impact of Adjunct Faculty on Graduation Rates at Historically Black Institutions in the State; providing for the membership, duties, compensation, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make specified findings and recommendations by a specified date; requiring the Task Force to report to the Governor and specified committees by January 1, 2013; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Adjunct Faculty on Graduation Rates at
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-04-07 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-07 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2011-03-28 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Minorities
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Teachers