MD SB343 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified advisory bodies to issue informal advice instead of an advisory opinion; and specifying that information related to informal advice provided by an advisory body shall remain confidential and is not subject to specified publication requirements.
Title
Public Ethics - Advisory Bodies - Advisory Opinions and Informal Advice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |