MD SB340 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making or causing to be made a false statement, report, or complaint to a governmental emergency report recipient with reckless disregard of causing bodily harm to an individual as a direct result of a response to the statement, report, or complaint; and providing that a person who violates the Act, in addition to any penalties imposed, is civilly liable to an individual harmed by the violation.
Title
Criminal Law - False Statements - Emergency or Commission of Crime (Antiswatting Act of 2023)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 699 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2023-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {393828/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB745 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 698
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Fraud
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Reimbursement Rates
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Fraud
Jurisdiction
Juvenile Causes
Law Enforcement
Liability
Penalties and Sentences
Reimbursement Rates
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 9 | 501.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |