MD SB331 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1039

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law specifying that certain provisions of law apply only to adoptions in which a juvenile court enters an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000; altering, from 21 to 18, the age at which an adoptee, or biological parent if the adoptee is at least 18 years old, may apply for a copy of certain birth and adoption records; requiring the Director of Social Services to develop and make available a certain contact preference form; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-11-01SenatePre-filed
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB1039 (Carry Over) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB999 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law5321(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5339(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5351(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law5359(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53A-19(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53A-35(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53A-42(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53B-21(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law53B-29(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law54B-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law54B-02(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law54B-11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General4211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback