MD HB999 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB743
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law specifying that certain provisions of law apply only to adoptions in which a juvenile court enters an order for adoption on or after January 1, 2000; altering, from 21 to 18, the age at which an adoptee, or biological parent if the adoptee is at least 18 years old, may apply for a copy of certain birth and adoption records; requiring the Director of Social Services to develop and make available a certain contact preference form; etc.
Title
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB331 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Favorable Rejected (16-31)
SB743 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
SB743 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Age of Majority
Disclosure
Family Law
Forms
Health, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Records
Social Services
Vital Records
Age of Majority
Disclosure
Family Law
Forms
Health, Department of
Juvenile Causes
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Records
Social Services
Vital Records
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Family Law | 5 | 321 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 339 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 351 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 359 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 3A-19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 3A-35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 3A-42 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 3B-21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 3B-29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 4B-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 4B-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 4B-11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 4 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0999?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0999f.pdf |