MD SB324 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to receive and process complaints involving alleged violations of certain air and water quality requirements in a certain manner; requiring the Department of the Environment to keep an electronic record of certain complaints for 10 years; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report, on or before September 30 each year, to the Governor and the General Assembly certain information relating to the enforcement of natural resources and conservation laws; etc.
Title
Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 443 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-9) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2021-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {880911/1 Adopted |
2021-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {984435/1 Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {984435/1 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-09-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB204 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Subjects
Accidents
Administrative Agencies
Air Pollution
Animals
Boats and Ships
Citations
Claims
Counties
Crabs
Damages
Data
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Fish and Fishing
Injury
Inspections
internet
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Oysters
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Administrative Agencies
Air Pollution
Animals
Boats and Ships
Citations
Claims
Counties
Crabs
Damages
Data
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Federal Government
Fish and Fishing
Injury
Inspections
internet
Licenses
Natural Resources - Generally
Oysters
Penalties and Sentences
Pollution
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Water
Water Pollution
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 1 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |