MD HB204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to receive and process complaints involving suspected environmental violations in a certain manner; requiring the Department of the Environment to maintain and update certain information involving suspected environmental violations; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to report, on or before September 30 each year, to the Governor and the General Assembly certain information relating to the enforcement of natural resources and conservation laws; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment and Natural Resources - Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement - Information Maintenance and Reporting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-09-28HousePre-filed
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB324 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-29 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment1305(n/a)See Bill Text
Natural Resources1211(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback