MD SB315 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying certain laws regarding net energy metering and community solar generating systems to customers served by a community choice aggregator; repealing a provision that prohibits a county or municipal corporation from acting as an aggregator under certain circumstances; establishing a process by which, beginning October 1, 2021, a county or municipal corporation or group of counties or municipal corporations may form or join a community choice aggregator; etc.
Title
Electric Industry - Community Choice Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] | Sen. Malcolm Augustine [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] |
Sen. Cheryl Kagan [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB561 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commercial Property
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counties
Data
Discrimination
Electronic Communication
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fees
Jurisdiction
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Public Service Commission
Publications
Renewable Energy Sources
Residential Property
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Commercial Property
Community Facilities and Services
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Counties
Data
Discrimination
Electronic Communication
Energy Matters
Equipment
Fees
Jurisdiction
Licenses
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prices
Public Service Commission
Publications
Renewable Energy Sources
Residential Property
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 306.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 510 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 510.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0315?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0315f.pdf |