MD SB313 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for specified annual preventive care including an annual child wellness visit, a routine gynecological visit, and an annual vision visit, including a vision examination, and specified health screenings if specified conditions are met; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Annual Preventive Care
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. David Harrington [D] | Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (140-1) | |
2010-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-26 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Finance |