MD SB303 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB277
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a dwelling owned by a public safety officer; repealing a certain limitation on the amount of the credit; requiring the governing body of a county or municipal corporation that authorizes the credit to establish, by law, the definition of "public safety officer" for purposes of eligibility for the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit – Public Safety Officer – Definition and Limitation on Credit Amount
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {169738/1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB303 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
HB420 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
HB420 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Armed Forces
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Safety
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Armed Forces
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Safety
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |