MD SB300 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring the Baltimore City Young Readers Program and the Young Readers Matching Grant Program to the Maryland State Library Agency and requiring the State Librarian to administer the programs; authorizing public libraries to apply for grants from the Young Readers Matching Grant Program; requiring the State Library Board, on or before December 1, 2024, to report every other year to the General Assembly on the effectiveness of the Young Readers Matching Grant Program; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Young Readers Program and Young Readers Matching Grant Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 650 |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {763926/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB243 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Subjects
Baltimore City
Data
Education - Miscellaneous
Governor
Grants
Libraries
Literacy
Low-Income
Minors
Postal Service
Poverty
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Data
Education - Miscellaneous
Governor
Grants
Libraries
Literacy
Low-Income
Minors
Postal Service
Poverty
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 8 | 1401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 8 | 1403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |