MD SB3 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Maryland Transportation Authority from fixing or revising a toll on any part of any transportation facilities project unless the General Assembly approves the toll through legislation; and prohibiting the Authority, on or after June 1, 2012, from charging and collecting a toll that exceeds the amount in effect on February 1, 2012, under specified circumstances.
Title
Maryland Toll Accountability Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-08-04 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0003.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0003f.pdf |