MD SB295 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Planning prepare and periodically revise inventory lists of the natural resources of the State and certain public works and facilities.
Title
Department of Planning - Inventory Responsibilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Data
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Planning, Department of
Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Utility Regulation
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Planning, Department of
Procurement
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |