MD SB294 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain construction material or warehousing equipment purchased for use in a certain federal facilities redevelopment area in Cecil County under certain circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide to the vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; etc.
Title
Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {389836/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-12-22 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB582 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Subjects
Cecil County
Construction
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Evidence
Exemptions
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Sales and Use Tax
Storage
Sunset
Taxes - Sales and Use
Construction
Environmental Matters
Equipment
Evidence
Exemptions
Federal Government
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Sales and Use Tax
Storage
Sunset
Taxes - Sales and Use
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 11 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |