MD HB582 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for certain construction material or warehousing equipment purchased for use in a certain federal facilities redevelopment area in Cecil County under certain circumstances; requiring a buyer claiming the exemption to provide to the vendor evidence of eligibility issued by the Comptroller; and terminating the Act after June 30, 2031.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cecil County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Federal Facilities Redevelopment Areas

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB294 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General11241(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback