MD SB292 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the qualifications for voter registration to allow an individual who is at least 16 years old to register to vote; specifying that an individual under the age of 18 years may vote in specified primary elections but may not vote in any other elections; altering the deadline to request a change of party affiliation to coincide with the deadline for registering to vote in an election; altering the date on which the number of petition signatures required for a candidate to be nominated by petition is determined; etc.
Title
Election Law - Voter Registration and Nomination by Petition - Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] |
Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Rona Kramer [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (100-40) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-10 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Minors
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Registration
Signatures
Voting
Elections Supervisors
Minors
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Registration
Signatures
Voting