MD SB289 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the name of the Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship to be the Douglas J. J. Peters Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship.
Title
Higher Education - Veterans of the Afghanistan and Iraq Conflicts Scholarship - Altering Name of Scholarship
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {333525/1 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/21 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Favorable |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Favorable |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB372 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-20 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment