MD SB289 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law that require the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the effect of competitive rating on the insurance markets in the State; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to continue to collect and analyze data relating to the competitiveness of specified insurance markets, to review and analyze information on the use of a specified factor in establishing specified rates, and to notify the Governor and the General Assembly of specified changes; etc.
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Rate Making for Automobile and Homeowner's Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 514 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {957173/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Boundaries
Committees and Commissions
Data
Disclosure
General Assembly
Governor
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Public Information
Reports
Committees and Commissions
Data
Disclosure
General Assembly
Governor
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Public Information
Reports