MD SB288 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the dates by which specified institutions of higher education and the Maryland Higher Education Commission must submit specified reports on the promotion and enhancement of cultural diversity at institutions of higher education.
Title
Higher Education - Cultural Diversity Programs - Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (132-7) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |