MD SB283 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a local board of elections to obtain input from large residential institutional communities including institutions of higher education, continuing care retirement communities, senior communities, and military installations when establishing precinct boundaries and designating polling places; establishing a process for certain voters to submit a federal post card application electronically, which may allow the use of a common access card only for verification of identity and fulfillment of the signature requirement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment 643720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-07SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (107-28)
2021-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {475261/1 Adopted
2021-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-10HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-09SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-05SenateFloor Amendment {643720/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-30)
2021-03-05SenateFloor Amendment {713723/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
2021-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {194234/1 Adopted
2021-03-04SenateMotion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
2021-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {194234/1
2021-03-03SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2021-03-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {194234/1
2021-03-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-01-19SenateHearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-09-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB156 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law2303(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3103(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3202.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3204(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law3204.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0283?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0283f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0283t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0283e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0283_19423401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0283_71372301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0283_64372001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0283_47526101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0283_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0350.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0362.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1115.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0968.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback