MD SB282 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring specified provisions of law relating to early childhood development from the Family Law Article to the Education Article; establishing the Division of Early Childhood Development within the State Department of Education; renaming the Early Childhood Development Advisory Council to be the Office of Child Care Advisory Council; etc.
Title
Early Childhood Development - Transfer of Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendment |
2016-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2016-04-01 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Kaiser) {643028/1 Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 11:45 a.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appeals
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Care
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Family Law
Fines
General Services, Department of
Grants
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Mental Health
Minors
Names
Notices
Petitions
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Search and Seizure
State Employees
Trials
Water
Advertising
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appeals
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Care
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Family Law
Fines
General Services, Department of
Grants
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Legislative Services, Department of
Licenses
Mental Health
Minors
Names
Notices
Petitions
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Buildings and Facilities
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Search and Seizure
State Employees
Trials
Water