MD SB278 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-13 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting employees and agents of federally designated organ procurement organizations who preserve or perfuse organs from deceased human donors for certain purposes from licensure requirements for perfusionists.
Title
Perfusionists - Licensure Exemption - Employees and Agents of Federally Designated Organ Procurement Organizations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB286 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-13 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 14 | 5E-01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 14 | 5E-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |