MD SB278 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum amount for a subtraction modification under the State income tax for military retirement income from $5,000 to $10,000 of military retirement income received; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.
Title
Income Tax - Military Retirement Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |