MD SB275 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a train or light engine used in connection with the movement of freight from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures regarding the specified crew requirements; establishing penalties of $500 for the first offense and $1,000 for a second offense and each subsequent offense committed within a period of 3 years of the second offense; etc.
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] |
Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Hershey) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {653325/2 Rejected (17-28) (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Hershey) Rejected (15-30) (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {653325/2 Rejected (17-28) (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {653325/2 Rejected (17-28) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (32-14) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Special Order until 3/9 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507371/1 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507371/1 |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Serafini) Adopted |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {507371/1 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Commuters
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Federal Government
Fuel
Labor and Industry, Division of
Legislative Services, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Railroads
Sunset
Transportation
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Commuters
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Federal Government
Fuel
Labor and Industry, Division of
Legislative Services, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Railroads
Sunset
Transportation
Utility Regulation
Work, Labor and Employment