MD SB266 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the owner or operator of a parking lot used by a continuing care retirement community to limit the amount of time that a motor vehicle is authorized to be parked in any parking space designated for the use of individuals with disabilities; prohibiting the owner or operator of a parking lot used by a continuing care retirement community from limiting the amount of time that a vehicle may be parked in a parking space designated for the use of individuals with disabilities to less than one-half hour; etc.
Title
Parking for Individuals With Disabilities – Continuing Care Retirement Facility – Time Limitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Continuing Care
Disabilities
Motor Vehicle Operation
Parking
Retirement Systems
Signs and Billboards
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Disabilities
Motor Vehicle Operation
Parking
Retirement Systems
Signs and Billboards
Time
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road