MD SB262 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1045
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain review of certain information technology platforms used by certain health occupations boards and make certain recommendations on the feasibility and cost of developing a certain common information technology platform; and requiring the Department to report certain findings and recommendations to the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee on or before December 1, 2021.
Title
Department of Information Technology - Study of a Common Information Technology Platform for Health Occupations Boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-28 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB224 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
SB1045 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1045 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Health Occupations
Information Technology, Department of
Language
Licenses
Notices
Prices
Public Information
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Communications
Health Occupations
Information Technology, Department of
Language
Licenses
Notices
Prices
Public Information
Reports
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology