MD SB260 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; and requiring the Secretary of General Services to distribute certain broker rebate fees to the Fund.
Title
Department of General Services Broker Rebate Fee Fund - Established
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB773 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-31 - Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Comptroller
Fees
General Services, Department of
Leases and Rent
Procurement
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Treasurers
Comptroller
Fees
General Services, Department of
Leases and Rent
Procurement
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - Procurement
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 4 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |