MD SB252 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB38
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-04 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Minority Business Enterprise Procurement Contract Financing Program in the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority to provide working capital to qualified minority business enterprises to facilitate their ability to enter into and complete performance under State procurement contracts; requiring the Authority to manage, supervise, and administer the Program, provide loans and award grants to certain minority business enterprises, and adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Minority Business Enterprise Procurement Contract Financing Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB252 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Investments
Loans
Minorities
Procurement
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Treasurers
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Contracts
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Investments
Loans
Minorities
Procurement
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 578 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 579 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 5 | 580 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0252?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0252f.pdf |