MD SB25 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a historic vehicle registration for specified trucks, tractors, and motor homes; establishing qualifications for a historic motor vehicle registration under the Act; establishing fees; prohibiting a vehicle registered under the Act from being used for general daily transportation or commercial transportation on highways; exempting a vehicle registered under the Act from specified inspections; defining "historic motor vehicle"; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Trucks, Tractors, and Motor Homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Favorable with Amendments 328576/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments 328576/1 | |
2012-02-27 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/1 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-13 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-06 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-09-30 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Fees
Historical Matters
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Sports and Recreation
Trucks
Historical Matters
License Plates
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Sports and Recreation
Trucks