MD SB246 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution relating to the selection and tenure of circuit court judges; altering the method of filling vacancies in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for retention elections following an appointment to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of a circuit court; providing for a transitional period under which the terms of certain amendments are to become effective; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Referendum
Constitutional Amendments
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Referendum