MD SB236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a semester-long high school elective course in financial literacy and entrepreneurship; and authorizing each county board of education to implement the curriculum content beginning in the 2018-2019 school year.
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Curriculum - Development and Implementation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Curriculum
Education
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Curriculum
Education
Education, State Board of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students