MD SB231 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "eligible veteran" to include the Commissioned Corps of the Public Health Service and the Commissioned Corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for the purpose of granting a preference in hiring and promotion to eligible veterans, spouses of eligible veterans, and surviving spouses of eligible veterans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Hiring and Promotion Preferences - Veterans of Commissioned Corps

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2017-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-17HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2017-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-02-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-14SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-13SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-02-09SenateHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-20SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback