MD SB231 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the method used by the Attendant Care Program in the Department of Disabilities to determine sliding payment scales for specified eligible individuals; altering the description of a specified category of eligible individuals at risk of nursing facility placement; authorizing the Secretary of Disabilities to waive specified proportional requirements under specified circumstances; authorizing the Secretary to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Individuals with Disabilities - Attendant Care Program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-16 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-01-24 | Hearing 2/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Home Care Services
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Home Care Services
Rules and Regulations
Social Services