MD SB230 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to establish on or before September 1, 2012, standards for mastery of braille for use in English, language arts, and mathematics instruction for blind and visually impaired students; requiring the State Board and the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to review and, as appropriate, modify certification and recertification requirements for specified teachers; etc.
Title
Education - Instruction of Blind and Visually Impaired Students - Use of
Sponsors
Sen. James Brochin [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] |
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Brian Frosh [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Lisa Gladden [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Board of
Language
Licenses
Public Schools
Special Education
Students
Teachers
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Board of
Language
Licenses
Public Schools
Special Education
Students
Teachers