MD SB229 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Blue Ribbon Commission on Maryland Transportation Funding; requiring the Commission to review, evaluate, and make recommendations concerning specified issues; specifying the membership and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Governor to designate the chair of the Commission; prohibiting members of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; etc.
Title
Blue Ribbon Commission on Maryland Transportation Funding
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] |
Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. George Della [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (111-27) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters) | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Ways and Means & Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:15 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Highways
Legislative Services, Department of
Mass Transit
Pedestrians
Privatization
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Highways
Legislative Services, Department of
Mass Transit
Pedestrians
Privatization
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Transportation, Department of