MD SB228 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a District Court commissioner from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant who is registered or required to register as a certain sex offender under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Sex Offenders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseDelegates J. Lewis, Grammer, and Crutchfield
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenators Ready, Carter, and Lee
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {152115/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-21HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {988779/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0228&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0228f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0228t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0228e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_98877901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_15211501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_98332301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_89362301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0228.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0228_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0239.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0228_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0228_89362301.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1506.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1616.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1452.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback