MD SB225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the maximum amount of noneconomic damages that may be recovered in health care malpractice and other civil actions for a catastrophic injury under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic Injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Arbitration
Blind Persons
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Damages
Disabilities
Judicial Review
Liability
Medical Malpractice
Negligence
Wrongful Death
Blind Persons
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Damages
Disabilities
Judicial Review
Liability
Medical Malpractice
Negligence
Wrongful Death