MD SB222 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish procedures that require a foreclosure purchaser to submit to the Foreclosed Property Registry any change to certain information within 21 business days after the change is known to the purchaser; and requiring the Department to notify, by electronic means, on receipt of an initial registration or any change to certain information, authorized users from the county and the municipal corporation in which the property is located.
Title
Foreclosed Property Registry - Updated Information - Notice to Local Governments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Holmes) Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {800810/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Counties
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Foreclosure
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Real Property
Registration
Time
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Foreclosure
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Real Property
Registration
Time