MD SB220 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB485

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the term "sexual orientation" in the context of hate crimes; including gender identity in the list of characteristics on the basis of which a person may not commit certain acts; authorizing a court to require an offender convicted of hate crimes to complete an antibias education program in addition to any other penalties imposed; requiring the University System of Maryland to manage the development of an antibias education program by January 1, 2023; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Floor Amendment 653424/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386
2021-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (124-13)
2021-04-01HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2021-03-22HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-18HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2021-03-12HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-18HouseReferred Judiciary
2021-02-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-02-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-10SenateFloor Amendment {653424/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-32)
2021-02-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {203826/1 Adopted
2021-02-09SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2021-02-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {203826/1
2021-02-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-10-29SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB128 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
HB485 (Carry Over) 2020-01-24 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law10301(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10304(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10305(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10306(n/a)See Bill Text
Education12120(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback