MD HB128 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the term "sexual orientation" in the context of hate crimes; including gender identity in the list of characteristics protected by the prohibition on hate crimes; authorizing a court to require an offender convicted of hate crimes to complete an antibias education program; requiring the University System of Maryland to manage the development of an antibias education program that provides antibias education relevant to certain provisions of Maryland law by January 1, 2023; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Protected Groups and Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Floor Amendment 373820/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Floor Amendment 703125/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (Y: 47 N: 89 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 385
2021-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-06SenateFloor Amendment {373820/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (16-31)
2021-04-01SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (126-13)
2021-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-10HouseFloor Amendment {703125/1 (Delegate Long) Rejected (47-89)
2021-03-09HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Long) Adopted
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {582916/1 Adopted
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-01-15HouseHearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-10-29HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB220 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 386

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Law10301(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10304(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10305(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Law10306(n/a)See Bill Text
Education12120(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government20208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0128?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0128f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0128t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_385_hb0128t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0128_58291601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0128_70312501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0128_37382001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0128_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0128_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0377.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0338.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0907.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0908.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback