MD SB220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the provision of law that made the effectiveness of a certain provision of law authorizing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide dental services to certain adults contingent on the Maryland Dental Action Coalition making a certain determination; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage of Dental Services - Repeal of Contingency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-01HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-01-28SenateHearing 2/06 at 1:30 p.m.
2019-01-24SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback