MD SB22 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB131
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the crime of unnatural or perverted sexual practice.
Title
Criminal Law - Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB22 (Carry Over) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
HB209 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB209 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 8 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0022?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0022f.pdf |