MD HB209 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB54
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the crime of unnatural or perverted sexual practice.
Title
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice – Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-10) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB209 (Carry Over) 2022-02-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB22 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB22 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 11 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 8 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |