MD SB212 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain county residence or qualification information of a notary public to be printed on a certain notary stamp; and repealing the requirement that certain jurisdiction information be printed on a certain notary stamp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Notaries Public - Official Stamp of a Notary Public

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (135-1)
2021-04-02HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-17HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2021-01-29SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2021-01-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-01-26SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-01-26SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-01-04SenateHearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
2021-01-04SenateHearing canceled
2020-12-28SenateHearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2020-09-29SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government18217(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback