MD SB212 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting discrimination based on gender identity with regard to public accommodations, housing, and employment and by specified licensed or regulated persons; altering the applicability of specified provisions of law prohibiting discrimination in places of public accommodation; prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity with regard to commercial leasing; altering the applicability of provisions of law prohibiting discrimination in employment; providing specified immunity; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fairness for All Marylanders Act of 2014

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (82-57) (Y: 82 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDermott) {883023/1 Rejected (50-83) (Y: 50 N: 83 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Kipke) {483124/1 Rejected (53-79) (Y: 53 N: 79 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Boteler) {133626/1 Rejected (44-90) (Y: 44 N: 90 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDermott) {383828/1 Rejected (52-81) (Y: 52 N: 81 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Bates) {993828/1 Rejected (1-131) (Y: 1 N: 131 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Szeliga) Rejected (57-80) (Y: 57 N: 80 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Motion vote previous question (McHale) Adopted (79-58) (Y: 79 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-22 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {963220/1 Rejected (59-77) (Y: 59 N: 77 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/27 (ODonnell) Rejected (50-83) (Y: 50 N: 83 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2014-03-21 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/27 (Parrott) Rejected (47-87) (Y: 47 N: 87 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474
2014-03-28SenateReturned Passed
2014-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (82-57)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {883023/1 Rejected (50-83)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {483124/1 Rejected (53-79)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) {133626/1 Rejected (44-90)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate McDermott) {383828/1 Rejected (53-80)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Bates) {993828/1 Rejected (1-131)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (57-80)
2014-03-27HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate McHale) Adopted (79-58)
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {343329/1
2014-03-27HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {963220/1 Rejected (59-77)
2014-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-26HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
2014-03-26HouseMotion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (50-83)
2014-03-26HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {893726/1
2014-03-26HouseMotion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Parrott) Rejected (47-87)
2014-03-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-26HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-03-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2014-03-04SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2014-02-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-02-28SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Getty) {903721/2 Adopted
2014-02-28SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {783326/1 Withdrawn
2014-02-27SenateSpecial Order until 2/28 (Senator Jacobs) Adopted
2014-02-27SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {783326/1
2014-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {718878/1 Report Adopted
2014-02-26SenateLaid Over (Senator Pugh) Adopted
2014-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {718878/1
2014-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-02-04SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-16SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0212&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0212f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/sb/sb0212t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_474_sb0212t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_71887801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_78332601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_90372102.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_89372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_13362601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_34332901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_38382801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_48312401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_88302301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_96322001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0212_99382801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0212.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0212_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/sb0212_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,s-0402&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0761&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0762&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0798&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0799&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0800&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0801&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0802&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0803&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0804&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0805&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0212,h-0806&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback