MD SB211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB275
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program to provide temporary benefits to a covered individual who is taking leave from employment; establishing the Family and Medical Leave Insurance Fund; requiring, beginning January 1, 2022, certain employees, employers, and self-employed individuals to pay certain contributions; authorizing, beginning July 1, 2023, a covered individual taking certain leave from employment to submit a claim for benefits; authorizing the establishment of private employer plans; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB211 (Carry Over) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
HB375 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
HB375 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-08 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Armed Forces
Attorney General
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Consumer Price Index
Courts
dependents
Disclosure
Discrimination
Evidence
Forms
Foster Care
Health
Income Tax
Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Judgments
Judicial Review
Labor, Department of
Language
Leave
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Subpoenas
Testimony
Time
Unemployment
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Armed Forces
Attorney General
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Claims
Collective Bargaining
Consumer Price Index
Courts
dependents
Disclosure
Discrimination
Evidence
Forms
Foster Care
Health
Income Tax
Insurance
Investigations and Inquiries
Judgments
Judicial Review
Labor, Department of
Language
Leave
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Public Employees
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Subpoenas
Testimony
Time
Unemployment
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0211?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0211f.pdf |