MD SB209 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a county board of education to offer and provide to certain disabled and special education students whose schools are subject to a prolonged school closure an option to continue attending school or receiving education services after the student's anticipated graduation date; requiring a county board to provide a notice to the parents or guardians of eligible students about a student's option to continue attending school or receiving certain education services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special Education - Prolonged School Closure - Extension of Education Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-06SenateHearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-10-30SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB724 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education21305(n/a)See Bill Text
Education8404.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Education8413(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback