MD SB206 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Collection Agency Licensing Board in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2032, the termination provisions relating to certain statutory and regulatory authority of the Board.
Title
State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 7 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |