MD SB204 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date of the statewide primary election in the year in which the President of the United States is elected; altering the date of the primary election for municipal offices in Baltimore City in the year in which the President of the United States is elected; altering the deadline from 6 to 9 days after the filing dates for filing a petition to challenge a candidate's residency; clarifying specified provisions of law concerning the filling of specified vacancies in nomination; etc.
Title
Election Law - Primary Election Dates in the Presidential Election Year
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) |
2015-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {375567/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {943027/1 Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {233822/1 Adopted |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Special Order until 3/3 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {494434/1 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ballots
Baltimore City
Campaign Financing
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
Judicial Review
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Secretary of State
Baltimore City
Campaign Financing
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
Judicial Review
Petitions
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Secretary of State